WY SF0061 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing specified level I and level II studies; providing appropriations; requiring reports; providing for the reversion of unexpended funds; authorizing unobligated funds to be used to complete other designated projects as specified; providing an appropriation for the office of water programs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill - planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted SF0061JC001: 35-22-3-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted SF0061JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted SF0061JC001: 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 150 | |
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0067 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0067 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0067 |
2020-03-12 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0067 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-29 | Bill Number Assigned |