WY SF0105 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to concealed weapons permits; providing for renewal of concealed weapons permits for military personnel and spouses under specified conditions; providing an extension renewal period for deployed armed force members under specified circumstances; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Concealed weapons permit renewal-military duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 129 | |
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0042 | |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2020-03-09 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0042 | |
2020-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2020-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |