WY SF0149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state property and buildings; specifying boundaries of the state capitol complex; providing for management and operation of state property and facilities within the state capitol building and state capitol complex; transferring duties and obligations of the state capitol building rehabilitation and restoration oversight group as specified; repealing the existing advisory task force for capitol renovation; amending authority of the state building commission; making legislative findings; repealing executed provisions; specifying legislative areas; restricting alterations of the capitol building and grounds as specified; requiring review of, adoption of and modifications to the master plan for the state capitol complex; specifying severability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Capitol complex oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 197 | |
2019-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0077 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0077 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0077 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0077 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 |
2019-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-14 | House | H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-11 | House | :Rerefer to H12 - Rules |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-9-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-01 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |