AL SB145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset law; Alabama Board of Examiners in Counseling continued until October 1, 2026
Title
Sunset law; Alabama Board of Examiners in Counseling continued until October 1, 2026
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 907 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-04-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 907 |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-05 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 149 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |