AL SB152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Pilotage Commission as Class 2 municipality, commission may regulate maritime data used in Mobile Bay.
Title
State Pilotage Commission as Class 2 municipality, commission may regulate maritime data used in Mobile Bay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1115 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 617 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt - Roll Call 616 ZN89KKR-1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 617 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Sessions motion to Adopt - Roll Call 616 ZN89KKR-1 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1115 |
2024-05-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-05-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 617 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Sessions motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 616 ZN89KKR-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Mobile County Legislation 1st Substitute Offered ZN89KKR-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted ZN89KKR-1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Mobile County Legislation |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Mobile County Legislation |