AZ SB1054 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State construction project delivery methods
Title
State construction project delivery methods
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 46 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Construction Services
Construction-manager-at-risk
Contract Requirements
Definition
Design-build
Design-build Method
Job-order-contracting
Multiple Contracts
Procurement
Professional Services
Project Delivery
Project Delivery Methods
Public Buildings And Improvements - Title 34 (h)
Requirements Applicable
State Construction Project Delivery Methods
State Construction Services (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Construction-manager-at-risk
Contract Requirements
Definition
Design-build
Design-build Method
Job-order-contracting
Multiple Contracts
Procurement
Professional Services
Project Delivery
Project Delivery Methods
Public Buildings And Improvements - Title 34 (h)
Requirements Applicable
State Construction Project Delivery Methods
State Construction Services (h)
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 7363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7366 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7367 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |