AZ SB1057 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Internal revenue code; conformity
Title
Internal revenue code; conformity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2379 (Replaced by) 2024-03-18 - Chapter 7
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |