AZ SB1409 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military veteran spouses; tuition scholarships
Title
Military veteran spouses; tuition scholarships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-11 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-1-3-0-0) |
2024-02-29 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Education - Title 15
Eligibility
Military Veteran Spouses
Rules
Spouses Of Military Veterans Tuition Scholarship Fund
Tuition Scholarships
Eligibility
Military Veteran Spouses
Rules
Spouses Of Military Veterans Tuition Scholarship Fund
Tuition Scholarships