AZ SB1687 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-14 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-14 - House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Drive by shooting; weapon discharge
Title
Drive by shooting; weapon discharge
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1687 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1687 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-14 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-31-2-0) |
2024-06-14 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-06-14 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Assault And Related Offenses
Classification
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Drive By Shooting
Driver License Revocation
Forfeiture
Weapon Discharge
Classification
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definitions
Drive By Shooting
Driver License Revocation
Forfeiture
Weapon Discharge