FL H0801 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Chapter No. 2024-52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Chapter No. 2024-52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires FDLE to establish online, continued employment training component relating to Alzheimer's disease & related forms of dementia; requires training component be developed with DOEA; specifies instruction requirements for training; authorizes completion of such training to count toward certain requirement.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementia Training for Law Enforcement and Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#659 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#659 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Chapter No. 2024-52 | |
2024-04-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 208 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-22 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment 227167 adopted |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-22 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S208 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 801