IL HB1131 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill as modified by Senate Amendment No. 1 and makes the following changes. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Requires persons serving as Executive Director or otherwise involved with directing the affairs of a Regional Development Authority to file statements of economic interest with the Secretary of State. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Subjects Authority leaders, board members, and employees of Regional Development Authorities to regulation under the Act. Further amends the Southwestern Illinois Development Authority Act, the Quad Cities Regional Economic Development Authority Act, and the Tri-County River Valley Development Authority Law and amends the Central Illinois Economic Development Authority Act, the Eastern Illinois Economic Development Authority Act, the Joliet Arsenal Development Authority Act, the Riverdale Development Authority Act, the Southeastern Illinois Economic Development Authority Act, the Southern Illinois Economic Development Authority Act, the Upper Illinois River Valley Development Authority Act, the Illinois Urban Development Authority Act, the Western Illinois Economic Development Authority Act, and the Will-Kankakee Regional Development Authority Law. Adds provisions relating to requests for assistance, disclosure of economic interests, open meetings, record disclosure, and notice relating to commitment to support the financing of a project. Adds related definitions. Provides that a Board of an Authority may not meet or take any action without a quorum present.
Title
SW IL DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. David Friess [R] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Erica Harriss [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0517 |
2023-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2023 |
2023-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-18 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 112-001-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-001-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-001-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-05-12 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2023-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Koehler |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Local Government |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2023-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-02-15 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2023-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2023-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 520 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 520 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 520 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |