IL HB2188 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging and the Illinois Public Aid Code by changing all references to the Illinois State Police Medicaid Fraud Control Unit to the Office of the Attorney General Medicaid Fraud Control Unit. Amends the Illinois False Claims Act. Removes references to the Illinois State Police from the definition of "investigator". Provides that the Attorney General (rather than the Attorney General or the Illinois State Police) shall diligently investigate a civil violation for false claims under the Act. Provides that the Attorney General may issue subpoenas under the Act (rather than the Attorney General may delegate the authority to issue subpoenas under the Act to the Department of State Police). In provisions concerning the State Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund, provides that for all cases settled on or after October 1, 2023, one-third of the monies shall be paid to the Attorney General Whistleblower Reward and Protection Fund. Provides that the remaining two-thirds of the monies in the Fund shall be used for payment of awards to Qui Tam plaintiffs and as otherwise specified in this Act, with any remainder to the General Revenue Fund. Provides that the Attorney General shall direct the State Treasurer to make disbursement of funds. Effective immediately.
Title
ATTY GENERAL-MEDICAID FRAUD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0145 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date October 1, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.04a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 175 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 175 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 175 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 175 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |