IL HB3685 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the foster care expenses, not to exceed $1,000 in any taxable year, paid or incurred by the taxpayer with respect to a qualified dependent child. Provides that the credit may be prorated. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ADOPTION
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Jed Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |