IL HB4652 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 1 with the following changes. Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that "salary" includes stipends paid to an eligible cooperating teacher under the Board of Higher Education Act. Authorizes a person to establish optional credit for periods of service as a student teacher under a specified provision of the Board of Higher Education Act. In provisions requiring an additional employer contribution for certain salary increases greater than 6%, provides that the System shall exclude any stipends paid to an eligible cooperating teacher under the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Makes changes concerning how funds are to be distributed under the student teaching stipend program. Provides that the Board of Higher Education shall disburse funds to the State Board of Education, who shall disburse funds to each school district or early childhood education provider employing an eligible cooperating teacher (instead of having the Board of Higher Education disburse funds to educator preparation programs employing an eligible cooperating teacher). Makes related changes. Makes changes concerning when the report shall be completed. Provides that the Board of Higher Education shall provide guidance and technical assistance to educator preparation programs on the administration of the stipend program. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHR ED-STUDENT TEACH STIPEND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-023-000 |
2024-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2024-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2024-04-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-30 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Back To Higher Education Committee; |
2024-04-03 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Higher Education Committee; 003-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | To Higher Ed-Special Topics Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-02-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-02-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |