IL HB5521 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the definition of "public works" does not include federal construction projects. Defines "federal construction projects".
Title
PREVAILING WAGE-FED PROJECT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |