IL SB1653 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0099
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0099
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Requires the Department of Transportation, local authorities, or any responsible entity to erect and maintain hazard bars for all viaducts and underpasses with a clearance of less than 15 feet. Provides that the hazard bar shall hang at the same clearance level as the viaduct or underpass and at least 500 feet in front of the viaduct or underpass to alert motorists.
Title
HWY CD-UNDERPASS HAZARD BAR
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] | Rep. Nabeela Syed [D] |
Rep. Mary Canty [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Harry Benton [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0099 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-038-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 011-005-000 |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-04-13 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Ventura |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Ventura |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 011-006-001 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 012-006-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |