IL SB3410 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Substance Use Disorder Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning opiate prescriptions and educational materials.
Title
DHS-GAMBLING DISORDERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000 |
2024-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-05-20 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 068-038-000 |
2024-05-20 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-20 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-20 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 301 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 10-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 15-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 15-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 25-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 25-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 30-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 35-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 35-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 50-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 55-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 301 | 55-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |