IN SB0139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Psilocybin treatment program. Establishes the therapeutic psilocybin research fund, administered by the Indiana department of health (state department), to provide financial assistance to research institutions in Indiana to study the use of psilocybin to treat mental health and other medical conditions. Sets forth clinical study requirements. Requires a research institution that receives a grant to conduct a clinical study to prepare and submit a report to the interim study committee on public health, behavioral health, and human services, the state department, and the division of mental health and addiction.
Title
Psilocybin treatment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka, Moed, Garcia Wilburn |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senators Busch, Yoder, Pol added as coauthors |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senator Johnson T added as second author |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |