KY SB147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 231 to express the findings of the General Assembly relating to adult-oriented businesses and the need for regulation; define terms; establish distance parameters for the location of adult-oriented businesses in proximity to identified entities and locations; establish transition provisions for existing businesses; affirm the authority of local governmental units to supplement regulation of adult-oriented businesses; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to adult-oriented businesses and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa2 sfa3 RSN# 2963 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | received in House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | passed 32-6 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (2) and (3) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-05 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 05, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
Obscenity and Pornography
Public Safety
Civil Actions
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
Obscenity and Pornography
Public Safety