KY SB319 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 49.280 to expand definitions relating to crime victims compensation; amends KRS 49.300 to specify duties of the Crime Victims Compensation Board; amends KRS 49.310 to allow family members and caregivers of a victim to file claims; amends KRS 49.330 to increase access for victims to file claims; amends KRS 49.340 to limit the time for an investigation; amends KRS 49.350 to allow a claim in default to be revived; amends KRS 49.360 to increase the allowable amount of emergency awards; amends KRS 49.370 to raise award limits and expand the types of claims eligible for payment; amends KRS 49.390 to remove the requirement of financial hardship for the victim; amends KRS 49.400 to limit the penalty to the intentional filing of false information; amends KRS 216B.400 to increase the medical services eligible for reimbursement, amends KRS 216B.990 to require an online portal for reporting violations of KRS 216B.400 to aid in penalty enforcement; and amends KRS 49.380 to conform and to make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to victims of crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 344 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2992 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2992 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-15 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | received in House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-04 | Senate | reassigned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |