KY SJR58 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Transportation Cabinet to designate memorial highways and bridges throughout the state and erect appropriate signage; and directs the Transportation Cabinet to honor individuals with signs on the Country Music Highway, United States Route 23.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION designating honorary names for various roads and bridges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Adopt FINAL W/ hcs1 hfa2 RSN# 3256 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 472 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 471 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Adopt W/ scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 3019 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 472 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 471 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Adopt W/ scs1 sfa1 scta1 RSN# 3019 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 220) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | adopted 36-0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-04-15 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-04-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-28 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-03-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-22 | House | received in House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |