MD HB1182 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "restitution" to include disgorgement in certain provisions relating to remedies under the Maryland Antitrust Act.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Enforcement Remedies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-38) |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 11 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |