MD HB188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement for a law enforcement agency to file administrative charges relating to alleged police officer misconduct that is required to be reviewed by an administrative charging committee within 1 year and 1 day after a complaint is filed; requiring an administrative charging committee or law enforcement agency to file any administrative charges for alleged police officer misconduct that reasonably appears to be the subject of a criminal investigation within a certain period of time; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313026/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2023-10-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |