MD HB282 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, for a municipal corporation that does not maintain a police force, a technician employed by an agency may sign the statement alleging a violation recorded by a speed monitoring system that must be included in a citation.
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems - Agencies - Statements and Certificates of Violations
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Floor Amendment 703522/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-14 - House - Floor Amendment 703522/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-37) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {703522/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (38-97) |
2024-03-13 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {583826/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Citations
Equipment
Law Enforcement
Signatures
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Certifications
Citations
Equipment
Law Enforcement
Signatures
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |