MD SB197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 882
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 882
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to reimburse a residential service agency for personal assistance services only if the personal assistance services are provided by an individual classified as an employee.
Title
Residential Service Agencies - Reimbursement - Personal Assistance Services (Homecare Worker Rights Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 882 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-39) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-26 | House | Floor Amendment {293728/1 (Delegate Bagnall) Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-13) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {703621/1 Adopted |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB39 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 881
Subjects
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Home Care Services
Reimbursement Rates
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Home Care Services
Reimbursement Rates
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 4A-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |