MI SB0084 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons: firearms; purchase of firearms; prohibit if individual has an extreme risk protection order. Amends secs. 2, 2b, 5b & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0083'23
Title
Weapons: firearms; purchase of firearms; prohibit if individual has an extreme risk protection order. Amends secs. 2, 2b, 5b & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0083'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 91 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 91 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-03-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-21 | House | Received On 03/16/2023 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 91 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dayna Polehanki |
Same As/Similar To
SB0083 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Assigned Pa 0038'23