MI SB0348 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Reassigned To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Reassigned To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health: children; conversion therapy; prohibit. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding sec. 901a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0349'23
Title
Mental health: children; conversion therapy; prohibit. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding sec. 901a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0349'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mallory Mcmorrow |
Same As/Similar To
SB0349 (Same As) 2023-10-03 - Reassigned To Committee On Housing And Human Services