MO HB1481 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the operation of certain law enforcement agencies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the operation of certain law enforcement agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Christ [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 46 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 46 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 92 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2024-04-25 | House | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-25 | House | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-25 | House | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-18 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2024, 8:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2024-04-18 | House | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2024-04-02 | House | Read First Time (S) |
2024-03-28 | House | Delivered to the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 3 |
2024-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Taken Up |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |