MO HB1764 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of charter school in school districts in St. Charles County
Title
Authorizes the establishment of charter school in school districts in St. Charles County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Education Reform(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |