MO HB1960 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Regulatory Sandbox Act"
Title
Establishes the "Regulatory Sandbox Act"
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 131 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 110 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 110 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-25 | House | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2024, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-11 | House | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Rooom 1 |
2024-03-07 | House | Second read and referred: Economic Development and Tax Policy(S) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read First Time (S) |
2024-02-08 | House | Delivered to the Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 8 |
2024-02-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-02-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2024-02-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-02-05 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-02-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |