MO HB2837 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Alzheimer's state plan task force
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Alzheimer's state plan task force
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |