MO HB2895 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elections
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Bill Reconsidered (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |