MO SB1286 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to limitations on working after retirement for members of the Public School Retirement System and the Public Education Employee Retirement System
Title
Modifies provisions relating to limitations on working after retirement for members of the Public School Retirement System and the Public Education Employee Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled |