MO SB1287 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts corporations contracted with the state to provide dental care in correctional centers from the requirements for corporation licensure to practice dentistry
Title
Exempts corporations contracted with the state to provide dental care in correctional centers from the requirements for corporation licensure to practice dentistry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled |