MO SB1416 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5561S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5561S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a provision relating to pesticide labeling requirements
Title
Creates a provision relating to pesticide labeling requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5561S.04C) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | S First Read |