TN HB2032 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the offense of possessing a weapon in a building that prohibits or restricts weapons; allows a person with an enhanced handgun carry permit to carry a handgun into a business that prohibits or restricts weapons; removes penalties for violations of certain firearms provisions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Michael Hale [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. William Slater [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2912 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee