TN HB2423 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, entitles each county and municipality that adopts certain zoning reform strategies that support housing development to receive from the department of revenue up to 20 percent of the revenue collected from the recordation tax based on transactions in the respective jurisdiction. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 7 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 13, Chapter 7 and Title 67, relative to housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2237 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee