TX HB2334 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from the plumbing licensing law for certain work performed on certain private property.
Title
Relating to an exemption from the plumbing licensing law for certain work performed on certain private property.
Sponsors
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] |
Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#809 (Y: 119 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#809 (Y: 119 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#809 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2446 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB2446 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB2446 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce