VA HB277 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection; transparency in ticket fees; civil penalties. Requires any person selling or reselling a ticket to an event to clearly and conspicuously display the total cost of the ticket from the first time a price is displayed and any time thereafter. The bill allows for a civil penalty of not less than $1,000 nor more than $5,000 for each violation.
Title
Consumer protection; transparency in ticket fees, civil penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Laura Jane Cohen [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2024-03-09 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Conference report rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Conference report rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference substitute printed 24109146D-H1 |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Helmer, Ward, Ballard |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Pekarsky, Ebbin, Reeves |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 24108356D-S1 (1-Y 97-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB277S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108356D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108356D-S1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 24-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 24-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 24101116D-E |
2024-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB277E |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101116D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 466.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 466.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |