WA SB5412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing local governments' land use permitting workloads.
Title
Reducing local governments' land use permitting workloads.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 368, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-04-17 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2023-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted and floor amendment |
2023-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-24 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Transportation. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70b | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21c | 229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |