WI AB410 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 252.14 (1) (ar) 14., 448.978 (1) and 448.978 (2) (d) 1. and 2.; to renumber and amend 440.03 (13) (c), 448.015 (4) (am) 2m., 448.974 (2) and 448.978 (2) (d) (intro.); to amend 49.45 (9r) (a) 7. e., 97.67 (5m) (a) 3., 118.2925 (1) (f), 146.81 (1) (eu), 146.997 (1) (d) 4., 154.01 (3) (b), 155.01 (1g) (c), 155.01 (7), 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 440.03 (9) (a) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.), 440.094 (1) (c) 4., 440.15, 448.971 (2), 448.972 (1), 448.973 (2), 448.974 (title), 448.978 (2) (intro.), 448.978 (2) (a), 448.978 (2) (g), 450.10 (3) (a) 5., 462.02 (2) (e), 462.04, 895.48 (1m) (a) (intro.), 971.14 (4) (a) and 990.01 (27s); to repeal and recreate 16.417 (1) (e) 3m. and 252.15 (1) (am); and to create 14.835, 111.335 (4) (jm), 440.03 (11m) (c) 2c., 440.03 (13) (c) 1. i., 440.094 (1) (c) 9m., 448.971 (1L), 448.971 (1m), 448.974 (1m), 448.974 (2) (bm) and subchapter XIII of chapter 448 [precedes 448.988] of the statutes; Relating to: ratification of the PA Licensure Compact. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the PA Licensure Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2023-11-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-13 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2023-10-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-05 | House | Representative Billings added as a coauthor |
2023-09-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-28 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2023-09-25 | House | LRB correction |
2023-09-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2023-09-06 | House | Introduced |