AL HB129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Hope and Opportunity for Our Students’ Education (CHOOSE) Act of 2024, established to provide education savings accounts (ESAs) for parents of children to use in providing education services for those children.
Title
Creating Hope and Opportunity for Our Students’ Education (CHOOSE) Act of 2024, established to provide education savings accounts (ESAs) for parents of children to use in providing education services for those children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Second House (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Singleton amendment 48XF3RI-1 (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Singleton amendment RPQINNN-1 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Smitherman amendment DKC9NHH-1 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Second House (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Instrument Change Tabled AKB2S7S-1 (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Instrument Change Tabled RTZSNNY-1 (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Instrument Change Tabled NYYG88T-1 (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Lovvorn amendment 68BQ1Z3-1 (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Stubbs substitution AB9L77Q-1 (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Singleton amendment 48XF3RI-1 (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Singleton amendment RPQINNN-1 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Smitherman amendment DKC9NHH-1 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Second House (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Instrument Change Tabled AKB2S7S-1 (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Instrument Change Tabled RTZSNNY-1 (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Instrument Change Tabled NYYG88T-1 (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Lovvorn amendment 68BQ1Z3-1 (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Stubbs substitution AB9L77Q-1 (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Enacted |
2024-03-08 | House | Enacted |
2024-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-06 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 180 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Orr motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote VK4HVVP-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Stutts 2nd Amendment Offered VK4HVVP-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Orr motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote RPI5YNY-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Stutts Amendment Offered RPI5YNY-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 179 48XF3RI-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Singleton 2nd Amendment Offered 48XF3RI-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 178 RPQINNN-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered RPQINNN-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 177 DKC9NHH-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered DKC9NHH-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed |
2024-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 131 |
2024-02-27 | House | Garrett motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 130 AKB2S7S-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Harrison Amendment Offered AKB2S7S-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Garrett motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 129 RTZSNNY-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Yarbrough Amendment Offered RTZSNNY-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Garrett motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 128 NYYG88T-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Mooney Amendment Offered NYYG88T-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 127 68BQ1Z3-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Lovvorn Amendment Offered 68BQ1Z3-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 126 AB9L77Q-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | W&ME Substitute Offered AB9L77Q-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted AB9L77Q-1 |
2024-02-22 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |