AL HB138 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil immunity, provided to persons providing transportation to health care providers without compensation, exceptions
Title
Civil immunity, provided to persons providing transportation to health care providers without compensation, exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 777 |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 776 |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 775 |
2018-03-13 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |