AL HB138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation of federal funds from the American Rescue Plan Act - State Small Business Credit Initiative Fund to the Department of Finance for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Title
Supplemental appropriation of federal funds from the American Rescue Plan Act - State Small Business Credit Initiative Fund to the Department of Finance for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 384 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-15 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-11 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 384 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 192 |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |