AL HB147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, students, authorized to use sunscreen at school
Title
Schools, students, authorized to use sunscreen at school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 210 |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 209 |
2017-03-09 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 208 |
2017-03-09 | House | Education Policy first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |