AL HB155 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on May 16, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on May 16, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2018.
Title
General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 7 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 7 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:12 p.m. on May 16, 2017. |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-338. |
2017-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 869 |
2017-05-11 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 868 |
2017-05-11 | House | Chestnut motion to Concur In and Adopt offered |
2017-05-11 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Pittman motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 920 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 919 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 918 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 917 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 916 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed |
2017-03-14 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 267 |
2017-03-14 | House | Holmes (A) motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-14 | House | Holmes (A) 1st Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 266 |
2017-03-14 | House | Wadsworth Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 265 |
2017-03-14 | House | Ingram Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 264 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rogers Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 263 |
2017-03-14 | House | Polizos Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 262 |
2017-03-14 | House | Knight Amendment Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 261 |
2017-03-14 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |