AL HB179 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Table (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Table (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018. |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-502. |
2018-03-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-28 | House | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1077 |
2018-03-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 843 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 842 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 841 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Dial Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Dial motion to Table adopted Roll Call 840 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-02-13 | House | Engrossed |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 315 |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 314 |
2018-02-13 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2018-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |