AL HB208 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Divorce, retirement benefits, valuation and distribution, Sec. 30-2-51 am'd.
Title
Divorce, retirement benefits, valuation and distribution, Sec. 30-2-51 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017. |
2017-04-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-162. |
2017-04-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 566 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Williams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Nay" |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 304 |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |