AL HB235 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to crimes and offenses; to amend Section 13A-10-11, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the definition of "peace officer" regarding the crime of impersonating a peace officer; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to crimes and offenses; to amend Section 13A-10-11, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the definition of "peace officer" regarding the crime of impersonating a peace officer; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-27 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-27 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-27 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |