AL HB235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Scope of practice of architecture and duties of board
Title
Scope of practice of architecture and duties of board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1117 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 540 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 539 IMPHZW6-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 540 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 539 IMPHZW6-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-08 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-08 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1117 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 540 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 539 IMPHZW6-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Engrossed Substitute Offered IMPHZW6-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions IMPHZW6-1 |
2024-03-20 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 2nd Amendment 3QMIVEZ-1 |
2024-03-20 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Amendment ITE1ZWW-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |